TX SB434 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a task force to address the relationship between domestic violence and child abuse and neglect.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a task force to address the relationship between domestic violence and child abuse and neglect.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-21 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-21 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-20 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-06 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-04 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-04 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-04 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-03 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-05-03 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-03 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-02 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Human Services | |
2011-04-28 | Read first time | |
2011-04-20 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-20 | Record vote | |
2011-04-20 | Passed | |
2011-04-20 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-20 | Record vote | |
2011-04-20 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-20 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-20 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-20 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-13 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-04-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-07 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-07 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2011-02-02 | Read first time | |
2011-01-28 | Filed | |
2011-01-28 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Family Violence
Family--Parent & Child
TASK FORCE TO ADDRESS THE RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND CHILD ABUSE AND NEGLECT
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Family Violence
Family--Parent & Child
TASK FORCE TO ADDRESS THE RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND CHILD ABUSE AND NEGLECT