TX SB43 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective on 1/1/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to residential mortgage loans, including the financing of residential real estate purchases by means of a wrap mortgage loan; providing licensing and registration requirements; authorizing an administrative penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to residential mortgage loans, including the financing of residential real estate purchases by means of a wrap mortgage loan; providing licensing and registration requirements; authorizing an administrative penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#723 (Y: 101 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Amended RV#713 (Y: 91 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-24 Effective on 1/1/22
2021-05-24 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-12 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-12HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-12SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-10SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-10HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-10SenateRecord vote
2021-05-10SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-10SenateRead
2021-05-10SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-05SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#723
2021-05-05HousePassed
2021-05-05HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#713
2021-05-04HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-04HouseAmended 1-Parker
2021-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-04HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 216
2021-05-04HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-23HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-12HouseReferred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
2021-04-12HouseRead first time
2021-04-07HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-06SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-06SenateRecord vote
2021-04-06SenatePassed
2021-04-06SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-06SenateRecord vote
2021-04-06SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-06SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-06SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-06SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-06SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-30SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2021-03-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-26SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-26SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-11-09SenateFiled
2020-11-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB216 (Similar To) 2021-05-04 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB43
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00043I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00043S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00043E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00043H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00043F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00043H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00043I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00043I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00043E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00043H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00043F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00043F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-06-F.PDF#page=9
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB43&RcdVtNo=713&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB43&RcdVtNo=723&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-10-F.PDF#page=24

Bill Comments

feedback