TX SB423 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas to invest in certain hedge funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas to invest in certain hedge funds.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-27SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-27SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-25SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-14SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-14SenateRead first time
2019-01-23SenateFiled
2019-01-23SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1612 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - Sent to the Governor

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback