TX SB420 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to dispenser requirements for refilling prescriptions for certain controlled substances.
Title
Relating to dispenser requirements for refilling prescriptions for certain controlled substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-28 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB577 (Same As) 2019-03-20 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Crimes--Drugs
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations