TX SB42 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public school accountability for bilingual education and English as a second language and other special language programs.
Title
Relating to public school accountability for bilingual education and English as a second language and other special language programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2012-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
2012-11-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Bilingual
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
ENGLISH LANGUAGE
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Bilingual
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
ENGLISH LANGUAGE
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=SB42 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/SB00042I.htm |