TX SB416 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to legal counsel provided by the attorney general to a political subdivision subject to a declared state of disaster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to legal counsel provided by the attorney general to a political subdivision subject to a declared state of disaster.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-08HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-07SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-06SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-06SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#962
2019-05-03HousePassed
2019-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-03HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 3751
2019-05-01HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-18HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-04-12HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-06SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-06SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-28SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-02-28SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-02-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-28SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-14SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-14SenateRead first time
2019-01-23SenateFiled
2019-01-23SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3751 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback