TX SB415 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the entry of a plea by defendants charged with certain misdemeanors involving family violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the entry of a plea by defendants charged with certain misdemeanors involving family violence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-04-12HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-06SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-06SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-28SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-02-28SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-02-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-28SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-14SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-14SenateRead first time
2019-01-23SenateFiled
2019-01-23SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2896 (Same As) 2019-04-15 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback