TX SB41 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 1/1/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the consolidation and allocation of state civil court costs; increasing certain civil court costs; authorizing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the consolidation and allocation of state civil court costs; increasing certain civil court costs; authorizing fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1500 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective on 1/1/22
2021-06-14 Filed without the Governor's signature
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-31SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-29HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-29SenateRecord vote
2021-05-29SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-29SenateRead
2021-05-29SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-27SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1500
2021-05-26HousePassed
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-26HouseAmended 1-Leach
2021-05-26HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-26HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-23HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-19HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-07HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2021-05-07HouseRead first time
2021-05-06HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-05-05SenateReported engrossed
2021-05-05SenateRecord vote
2021-05-05SenatePassed
2021-05-05SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-05SenateRecord vote
2021-05-05SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05SenateAmendment adopted as amended FA1 Zaffirini
2021-05-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05SenateAmendment amended
2021-05-05SenateAmendment to amendment offered FA2 Hinojosa
2021-05-05SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Zaffirini
2021-05-05SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-05SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-05SenateCo-author authorized
2021-05-03SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-28SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-28SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-08SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-04-08SenateRereferred to committee
2021-03-03SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-11-09SenateFiled
2020-11-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4417 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
HB4417 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB41
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00041I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00041S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00041E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00041H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00041F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00041S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00041S2F2.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00041H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00041I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00041I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00041S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00041S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00041E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00041H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00041H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00041F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00041F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-05-F.PDF#page=24
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB41&RcdVtNo=1500&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-29-F.PDF#page=61

Bill Comments

feedback