TX SB41 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to exemptions to reporting and list requirements for certain attorneys ad litem, guardians ad litem, amicus attorneys, mediators, and guardians.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to exemptions to reporting and list requirements for certain attorneys ad litem, guardians ad litem, amicus attorneys, mediators, and guardians.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1648 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-22HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1648
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-03-28HouseRead first time
2019-03-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-03-19SenateReported engrossed
2019-03-19SenateRecord vote
2019-03-19SenatePassed
2019-03-19SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-19SenateRecord vote
2019-03-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-03-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-03-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-03-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-13SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-03-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-01SenateRead first time
2018-11-12SenateFiled
2018-11-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1285 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback