TX SB402 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the preference given by trial courts to hearings and trials for murder and capital murder offenses.
Title
Relating to the preference given by trial courts to hearings and trials for murder and capital murder offenses.
Sponsors
Sen. John Whitmire [D] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Joan Huffman [R] |
Sen. Borris Miles [D] | Rep. Sam Harless [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1990 (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-23 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1990 |
2023-05-23 | House | Passed |
2023-05-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-04-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-16 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Passed |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1564 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
HB1564 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
HB1564 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence