TX SB402 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the municipal sales and use tax for street maintenance.
Title
Relating to the municipal sales and use tax for street maintenance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-05-13 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Filed |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1538 (Same As) 2021-03-08 - Referred to Ways & Means
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
City Government--Roads
Elections
Elections--Initiative, Referendum & Recall
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
City Government--Finance
City Government--Roads
Elections
Elections--Initiative, Referendum & Recall
Taxation
Taxation--Sales