TX SB4 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Effective on 9/24/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Effective on 9/24/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the composition of districts for the election of members of the United States House of Representatives from Texas.
Title
Relating to the composition of districts for the election of members of the United States House of Representatives from Texas.
Sponsors
Sen. Kel Seliger [R] | Rep. Drew Darby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Effective on 9/24/13 | |
2013-06-26 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-06-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-06-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-06-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-06-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-06-23 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-06-21 | House | Record vote |
2013-06-21 | House | Passed |
2013-06-21 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-06-21 | House | Postponed |
2013-06-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-06-20 | House | Record vote |
2013-06-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-06-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-06-20 | House | Record vote |
2013-06-20 | House | Amendment tabled |
2013-06-20 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2013-06-20 | House | Record vote |
2013-06-20 | House | Amendment to amendment tabled |
2013-06-20 | House | Amendment to amendment withdrawn |
2013-06-20 | House | Amendment to amendment withdrawn |
2013-06-20 | House | Amendment to amendment withdrawn |
2013-06-20 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-06-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-06-20 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2013-06-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-06-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-06-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-06-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-06-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-06-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-06-18 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-06-17 | House | Referred to Redistricting, Select |
2013-06-17 | House | Read first time |
2013-06-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Statement(s) submitted |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Passed |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Statement(s) submitted |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Passed to engrossment |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-06-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-06-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-06-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Redistricting, Select |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Filed |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |