TX SB386 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Referred to Urban Affairs
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a common characteristic or use project in a public improvement district in certain municipalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a common characteristic or use project in a public improvement district in certain municipalities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2019-04-12HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-02-14SenateRead first time
2019-01-18SenateFiled
2019-01-18SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB951 (Same As) 2019-04-18 - Reported engrossed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback