TX SB383 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the repeal of certain provisions governing the sale and use of certain refrigerants.
Title
Relating to the repeal of certain provisions governing the sale and use of certain refrigerants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - House - SB 383Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-16 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-15 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-15 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed |
2013-05-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-14 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2013-04-16 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-14 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Passed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
REFRIGERANTS & REFRIGERATION
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
REFRIGERANTS & REFRIGERATION
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General