TX SB381 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-30 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-30 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the authority of physicians to delegate to certain pharmacists the implementation and modification of a patient's drug therapy.
Title
Relating to the authority of physicians to delegate to certain pharmacists the implementation and modification of a patient's drug therapy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-30 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-05-30 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-20 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-20 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-19 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-19 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-19 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-19 | Record vote | |
2009-05-19 | Passed | |
2009-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-19 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-19 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-29 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-21 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-21 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-26 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-03-25 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-03-25 | Record vote | |
2009-03-25 | Passed | |
2009-03-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-03-25 | Record vote | |
2009-03-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-03-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-03-25 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-03-25 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-03-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-23 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-23 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-17 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2008-12-18 | Filed | |
2008-12-18 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB427 (Same As) 2009-02-18 - Referred to Public Health
Subjects
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
PHYSICIANS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
PHYSICIANS