TX SB378 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the liability of certain social workers who provide volunteer health care services to charitable organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the liability of certain social workers who provide volunteer health care services to charitable organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-30 - House - SB 378Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-15 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-05-15 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-05 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-05HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-05SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-04SenateReported enrolled
2015-05-04SenateHouse passage reported
2015-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-30HouseRecord vote
2015-04-30HousePassed
2015-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-30HousePassed to 3rd reading
2015-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-30HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2015-04-30HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2015-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-04-29HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2015-04-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-27HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2015-04-27HouseRead first time
2015-03-31HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-03-31SenateReported engrossed
2015-03-31SenateRecord vote
2015-03-31SenatePassed
2015-03-31SenateRead 3rd time
2015-03-31SenateRecord vote
2015-03-31SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-03-31SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-03-31SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2015-03-31SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-03-30SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-03-25SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-03-25SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-03-25SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-03-23SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-03-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-02-02SenateReferred to State Affairs
2015-02-02SenateRead first time
2015-01-28SenateFiled
2015-01-28SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback