TX SB378 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the date by which a pest management zone or cotton grower may request an extension of the cotton stalk destruction deadline.
Title
Relating to the date by which a pest management zone or cotton grower may request an extension of the cotton stalk destruction deadline.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Hegar [R] | Rep. Todd Hunter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-05-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-09 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-09 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-06 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-06 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-05 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-05 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2011-05-03 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-02 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-02 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-29 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-29 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-29 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-21 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-21 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-14 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-07 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-07 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | |
2011-02-02 | Read first time | |
2011-01-19 | Filed | |
2011-01-19 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |