TX SB374 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to municipal annexation of certain rights-of-way.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to municipal annexation of certain rights-of-way.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#983 (Y: 121 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective immediately
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-27SenateRead
2021-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-18SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseRecord vote RV#983
2021-05-11HousePassed
2021-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-10HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-10HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-10HouseAmended 1-Shine
2021-05-10HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-10HouseLaid out in lieu of companion CSHB 1241
2021-05-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-28HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-28HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-14HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2021-04-14HouseRead first time
2021-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-09SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenatePassed
2021-04-09SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-09SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-09SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-25SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-25SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-25SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-24SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-24SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-09SenateReferred to Transportation
2021-03-09SenateRead first time
2021-01-21SenateFiled
2021-01-21SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1241 (Same As) 2021-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB374
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00374I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00374S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00374E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00374H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00374F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00374H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00374I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00374I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00374S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00374S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00374E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00374H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00374F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00374F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-09-F.PDF#page=2
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB374&RcdVtNo=983&Ch=H&Dt=05/11/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=40

Bill Comments

feedback