TX SB374 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the cessation of tolls by toll project entities in certain circumstances.
Title
Relating to the cessation of tolls by toll project entities in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hall [R] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB436 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Left pending in subcommittee
Subjects
Highways
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TOLL ROADS & TOLL BRIDGES
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TOLL ROADS & TOLL BRIDGES
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB374 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00374I.htm |