TX SB367 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the requirements for an application for a permit to drill an oil or gas well at a site adjacent to a well blowout site.
Title
Relating to the requirements for an application for a permit to drill an oil or gas well at a site adjacent to a well blowout site.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1398 (Y: 92 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1398 |
2021-05-24 | House | Passed |
2021-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-23 | House | Amended 3-Craddick |
2021-05-23 | House | Amended 2-Craddick |
2021-05-23 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-05-23 | House | Postponed 5/23/21 10:40 AM |
2021-05-23 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-05-23 | House | Postponed 5/23/21 10:15 PM |
2021-05-23 | House | Amendment withdrawn 1-Craddick |
2021-05-23 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2 |
2021-05-23 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-Craddick |
2021-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-22 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Energy Resources |
2021-04-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-13 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Filed |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Environment
Environment--Air
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Oil & Gas
PERMITS
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Safety
Environment
Environment--Air
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Oil & Gas
PERMITS
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Safety