TX SB361 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain contracts for the transfer of a pet.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain contracts for the transfer of a pet.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-13HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2019-04-03HouseRead first time
2019-04-02HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-01SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-01SenateRecord vote
2019-04-01SenatePassed
2019-04-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-01SenateRecord vote
2019-04-01SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-01SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-01SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-01SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-20SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-14SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-05SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-05SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-05SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-05SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2019-01-16SenateFiled
2019-01-16SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1097 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback