TX SB352 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-25 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-25 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to visitation for certain children in the temporary managing conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Title
Relating to visitation for certain children in the temporary managing conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-10 - House - SB 352Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-25 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-05-25 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-14 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-13 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-10 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-10 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-10 | House | Passed |
2013-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-10 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-10 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-10 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2013-05-09 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2013-04-08 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |