TX SB350 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the repeal of certain laws regulating the sale or transfer of secondhand watches.
Title
Relating to the repeal of certain laws regulating the sale or transfer of secondhand watches.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Filed |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Business & Commerce--Trade Practices
Consumer Protection
Business & Commerce--General
Business & Commerce--Trade Practices
Consumer Protection