TX SB348 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prohibition on posting on the Internet information held by an appraisal district regarding certain residential property.
Title
Relating to the prohibition on posting on the Internet information held by an appraisal district regarding certain residential property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1845 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2023-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-19 | House | Record vote RV#1845 |
2023-05-19 | House | Passed |
2023-05-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-19 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-17 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-05-10 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-08 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-05-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-18 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2023-04-18 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |