TX SB346 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibiting the purchase of certain food and drink items under the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Title
Relating to prohibiting the purchase of certain food and drink items under the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB346 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB00346I.htm |