TX SB346 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the participation of open-enrollment charter schools and eligible nonprofit organizations in the Jobs and Education for Texans (JET) Grant Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the participation of open-enrollment charter schools and eligible nonprofit organizations in the Jobs and Education for Texans (JET) Grant Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - House - Amended RV#695 (Y: 123 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#695
2021-05-04HousePassed as amended
2021-05-04HouseAmended 1-Dutton
2021-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-03HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-03HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 618
2021-04-28HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-21HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-21HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2021-04-21HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseReferred to International Relations & Economic Development
2021-04-14HouseRead first time
2021-04-13HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-12SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-12SenateRecord vote
2021-04-12SenatePassed
2021-04-12SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-12SenateRecord vote
2021-04-12SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-12SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-12SenateAmended
2021-04-12SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hinojosa
2021-04-12SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-12SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-06SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-31SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-24SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-24SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-24SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-09SenateReferred to Higher Education
2021-03-09SenateRead first time
2021-01-14SenateFiled
2021-01-14SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB618 (Same As) 2021-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB346
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00346I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00346S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00346E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00346H.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00346S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00346H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00346I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00346I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00346E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00346H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-12-F.PDF#page=28
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB346&RcdVtNo=695&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback