TX SB343 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Postponed 3/2/22 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Postponed 3/2/22 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the entry into the Texas Crime Information Center of certain information regarding conditions of bond imposed in criminal cases involving family violence.
Title
Relating to the entry into the Texas Crime Information Center of certain information regarding conditions of bond imposed in criminal cases involving family violence.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
Sen. Nathan Johnson [D] | Sen. Charles Perry [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] | Rep. Sam Harless [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Postponed 3/2/22 10:00 AM |
2021-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-04-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Filed |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CRIME VICTIMS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Electronic Information Systems
Family
Family--Family Violence
MAGISTRATES
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Electronic Information Systems
Family
Family--Family Violence
MAGISTRATES
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF