TX SB343 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prosecution of the offense of improper sexual activity with a person under supervision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prosecution of the offense of improper sexual activity with a person under supervision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-16HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-11HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-11HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-11HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-08HousePosting rule suspended
2017-05-04HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-05-04HouseRead first time
2017-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenatePassed
2017-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-05SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-01-30SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-01-30SenateRead first time
2016-12-16SenateFiled
2016-12-16SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback