TX SB342 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to exemption from the sales tax for certain water efficient products for a limited period.
Title
Relating to exemption from the sales tax for certain water efficient products for a limited period.
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Estes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in subcommittee |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=SB342 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/SB00342I.htm |