TX SB340 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of a grant program to assist law enforcement agencies with the purchase of opioid antagonists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of a grant program to assist law enforcement agencies with the purchase of opioid antagonists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-17HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-16HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-29HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-04-29HouseRead first time
2019-04-25HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-25SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-25SenateRecord vote
2019-04-25SenatePassed
2019-04-25SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-25SenateRecord vote
2019-04-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-23SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-16SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-04-16SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-04-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2019-01-11SenateFiled
2019-01-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1449 (Same As) 2019-02-27 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback