TX SB339 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the medical use of low-THC cannabis and the regulation of related organizations and individuals; requiring a dispensing organization to obtain a license to dispense low-THC cannabis and any employee of a dispensing organization to obtain a registration; authorizing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the medical use of low-THC cannabis and the regulation of related organizations and individuals; requiring a dispensing organization to obtain a license to dispense low-THC cannabis and any employee of a dispensing organization to obtain a registration; authorizing fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-19 - House - SB 339Third Reading House (Y: 108 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - House - SB 339Third Reading House (Y: 96 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 2 by Moody (Y: 98 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 1 by Moody (Y: 99 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-01 Effective immediately
2015-06-01 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-19SenateReported enrolled
2015-05-19SenateHouse passage reported
2015-05-19HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-19HouseRecord vote
2015-05-19HousePassed
2015-05-19HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2015-05-19HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-18HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-18HouseRecord vote
2015-05-18HousePassed to 3rd reading
2015-05-18HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2015-05-18HouseRecord vote
2015-05-18HouseAmendment tabled
2015-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-18HouseRecord vote
2015-05-18HouseAmendment tabled
2015-05-18HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2015-05-18HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-18HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-05-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-05-14HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-13HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-05-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-05-13HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2015-05-11HouseReferred to Public Health
2015-05-11HouseRead first time
2015-05-07HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-05-07SenateReported engrossed
2015-05-07SenateRecord vote
2015-05-07SenatePassed
2015-05-07SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-07SenateRecord vote
2015-05-07SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-07SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-07SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2015-05-07SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-07SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-05-07SenateCo-author authorized
2015-05-06SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-05-05SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-05SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-05-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-29SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-04-29SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-04-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-04-15SenateCo-author authorized
2015-03-03SenateCo-author authorized
2015-02-18SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2015-02-18SenateRereferred to committee
2015-02-02SenateReferred to State Affairs
2015-02-02SenateRead first time
2015-01-23SenateFiled
2015-01-23SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=SB339
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SB00339I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SB00339S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SB00339E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SB00339H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/SB00339F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=SB339&RcdVtNo=1180&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=SB339&RcdVtNo=1181&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=SB339&RcdVtNo=1182&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=SB339&RcdVtNo=1203&Ch=H&Dt=05/19/2015

Bill Comments

feedback