TX SB334 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to disclosure under the public information law of certain records of an appraisal district.
Title
Relating to disclosure under the public information law of certain records of an appraisal district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1539 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1539 |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed |
2021-05-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-25 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-04-26 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2488 (Same As) 2021-03-16 - Referred to Ways & Means