TX SB326 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 24 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on November 24 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to stabilizing the amount of tuition charged to certain residents of this state by general academic teaching institutions.
Title
Relating to stabilizing the amount of tuition charged to certain residents of this state by general academic teaching institutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-06 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-04-06 | Read first time | |
2008-11-24 | Filed | |
2008-11-24 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB335 (Similar To) 2009-04-15 - Left pending in committee