TX SB325 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to establishing a protective order registry and the duties of court personnel and other persons and entities in regard to the registry.
Title
Relating to establishing a protective order registry and the duties of court personnel and other persons and entities in regard to the registry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#772 (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-01 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-30 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-04-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | House | Record vote RV#772 |
2019-04-29 | House | Passed |
2019-04-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 629 |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-04-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB629 (Same As) 2019-04-26 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--Administration
Courts--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Electronic Information Systems
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
SUPREME COURT
Courts
Courts--Administration
Courts--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Electronic Information Systems
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
SUPREME COURT