TX SB323 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the review of ballot proposition language for certain political subdivision elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the review of ballot proposition language for certain political subdivision elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-13HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Elections
2019-04-12HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-14SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-04SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-07SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2019-01-10SenateFiled
2019-01-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3376 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback