TX SB321 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to contributions to, benefits from, and the administration of the Employees Retirement System of Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to contributions to, benefits from, and the administration of the Employees Retirement System of Texas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1506 (Y: 81 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1505 (Y: 64 N: 81 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-05-26 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1504 (Y: 62 N: 83 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-31SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-30SenateRecord vote
2021-05-30SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-30SenateSenate discharges conferees
2021-05-29HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2021-05-29SenateConference committee report filed
2021-05-29SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-29SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-29HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-29HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2021-05-29HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-29HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-29HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-29SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-29SenateSenate requests conference committee
2021-05-29SenateSenate refuses to concur
2021-05-29SenateRead
2021-05-29SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-28SenateCo-author authorized
2021-05-27SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1506
2021-05-26HousePassed as amended
2021-05-26HouseAmendment fails of adoption 4-Rosenthal
2021-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1505
2021-05-26HouseAmendment fails of adoption 3-Bucy
2021-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1504
2021-05-26HouseAmendment fails of adoption 2-C. Turner
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseAmended 1-Bonnen
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-25HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-25HousePoint of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 18(b), and Rule 4, Section 32(b)(10)
2021-05-25HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-25HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-07HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-03HousePosting rule suspended
2021-05-03HouseReferred to Appropriations
2021-05-03HouseRead first time
2021-04-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-28SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenatePassed
2021-04-28SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-28SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-28SenateAmended
2021-04-28SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman
2021-04-28SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-26SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-22SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-09SenateReferred to Finance
2021-03-09SenateRead first time
2021-03-02SenateCo-author authorized
2021-01-12SenateFiled
2021-01-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2707 (Same As) 2021-03-17 - Referred to Appropriations

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB321
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00321I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00321S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00321E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00321H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00321F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00321S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00321H31.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00321H32.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00321H33.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00321H34.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00321I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00321I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00321S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00321S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00321E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00321H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00321F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00321F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-28-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-28-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-28-F.PDF#page=34
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-28-F.PDF#page=35
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB321&RcdVtNo=1504&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB321&RcdVtNo=1505&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB321&RcdVtNo=1506&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-30-F.PDF#page=55

Bill Comments

feedback