TX SB319 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners; authorizing a reduction in fees; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners; authorizing a reduction in fees; providing penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] | Sen. Nicholas Taylor [R] |
Rep. Richard Raymond [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-27 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1958 (Y: 102 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1318 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1290 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - 1-Raymond RV#1274 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-27 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1958 (Y: 102 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1318 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1290 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - 1-Raymond RV#1274 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-27 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-27 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-27 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-18 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-18 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-18 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-18 | House | Passed |
2017-05-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-17 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-17 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-17 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-17 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-17 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2017-05-17 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2017-05-17 | House | Amendment to amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-17 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2017-05-17 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2017-05-17 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2017-05-16 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-16 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2017-05-16 | House | Amendment amended |
2017-05-16 | House | Amendment to amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-16 | House | Amendment amended |
2017-05-16 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-16 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2017-05-16 | House | Amendment amended |
2017-05-16 | House | Amendment amended |
2017-05-16 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-16 | House | Amended |
2017-05-16 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-16 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-16 | House | Amended |
2017-05-16 | House | Amended |
2017-05-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock |
2017-04-28 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, STATE OFFICE OF
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset--Commission Bills
VETERINARIANS
VETERINARY MEDICAL EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset--Commission Bills
VETERINARIANS
VETERINARY MEDICAL EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF