TX SB318 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the amount the Texas Military Preparedness Commission may grant to local governmental entities for certain purposes.
Title
Relating to the amount the Texas Military Preparedness Commission may grant to local governmental entities for certain purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] |
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] | Rep. Susan King [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - House - SB 318Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-26 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-20 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | House | Passed |
2015-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-19 | House | Amended |
2015-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-08 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2015-05-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-06 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2015-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Filed |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |