TX SB315 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the enforcement of subpoenas, the regulation of pain management clinics, and the adoption of guidelines for prescribing certain opioids by the Texas Medical Board.
Title
Relating to the enforcement of subpoenas, the regulation of pain management clinics, and the adoption of guidelines for prescribing certain opioids by the Texas Medical Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Amended RV#1636 (Y: 129 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1590 (Y: 127 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Amended RV#1636 (Y: 129 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1590 (Y: 127 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-23 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed as amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-22 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-12 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-05-12 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ACUPUNCTURE & ORIENTAL MEDICINE
ACUPUNCTURE EXAMINERS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
CRIMINAL RECORDS
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
MEDICAL RADIOLOGIC TECHNOLOGISTS
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PERFUSION
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANT BOARD, TEXAS
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS
PHYSICIANS
RESPIRATORY CARE PRACTITIONER
SUBPOENAS
Sunset
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset--Commission Bills
ACUPUNCTURE EXAMINERS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
CRIMINAL RECORDS
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
MEDICAL RADIOLOGIC TECHNOLOGISTS
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PERFUSION
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANT BOARD, TEXAS
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS
PHYSICIANS
RESPIRATORY CARE PRACTITIONER
SUBPOENAS
Sunset
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset--Commission Bills