TX SB315 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Status: Introduced on November 21 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Summary
Relating to the reapportionment of congressional districts and the creation, function, and duties of the Texas Congressional Redistricting Commission.
Title
Relating to the reapportionment of congressional districts and the creation, function, and duties of the Texas Congressional Redistricting Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-04 | Motion withdrawn | |
2009-05-04 | Motion to suspend regular order of business | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Motion to suspend regular order fails | |
2009-03-23 | Record vote | |
2009-03-23 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-03-23 | Record vote | |
2009-03-23 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-03-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-13 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-03-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-02 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-02 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-02-11 | Read first time | |
2008-11-21 | Filed | |
2008-11-21 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Congress
CONGRESSIONAL REDISTRICTING COMMISSION, TEXAS
Redistricting
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
CONGRESSIONAL REDISTRICTING COMMISSION, TEXAS
Redistricting
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed