TX SB312 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the punishment for the criminal offense of improper sexual activity with a person in custody; increasing a criminal penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the punishment for the criminal offense of improper sexual activity with a person in custody; increasing a criminal penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - Amended RV#1258 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-27SenateRead
2021-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-19SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-19HouseRecord vote RV#1258
2021-05-19HousePassed as amended
2021-05-19HouseAmended 1-Smith
2021-05-19HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-18HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-18HouseAmended 1-J.E. Johnson
2021-05-18HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-18HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-14HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-21HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-04-21HouseRead first time
2021-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed
2021-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-19SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-09SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-09SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-03-09SenateRead first time
2021-01-11SenateFiled
2021-01-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB376 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Referred to Jurisprudence

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB312
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00312I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00312S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00312E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00312H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00312F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00312H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00312H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00312I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00312I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00312H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00312F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00312F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-19-F1.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB312&RcdVtNo=1258&Ch=H&Dt=05/19/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=66

Bill Comments 750

feedback