TX SB301 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operations and functions of the Employees Retirement System of Texas and the sunset review date for, financial management of, and programs administered by the agency.
Title
Relating to the operations and functions of the Employees Retirement System of Texas and the sunset review date for, financial management of, and programs administered by the agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1457 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#567 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1457 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#567 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-20 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-19 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-17 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2017-05-16 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-16 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-11 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-11 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-11 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-01 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-04-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-28 | House | Passed |
2017-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-04-27 | House | Amended |
2017-04-27 | House | Amended |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-12 | House | Referred to Pensions |
2017-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-05 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees
Sunset
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset--Commission Bills
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees
Sunset
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset--Commission Bills