TX SB3 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-16 - Reported engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain curriculum in public schools, including certain instructional requirements and prohibitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain curriculum in public schools, including certain instructional requirements and prohibitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-16 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-16 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-16 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 4 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-07-16 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 4 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-07-16 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 4 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-07-16 - Senate - FA1 Hughes (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-16SenateReported engrossed
2021-07-16SenateRecord vote
2021-07-16SenatePassed
2021-07-16SenateRead 3rd time
2021-07-16SenateRecord vote
2021-07-16SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-07-16SenateRecord vote
2021-07-16SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-07-16SenateRecord vote
2021-07-16SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-07-16SenateAmendment(s) offered FA5 Zaffirini
2021-07-16SenateRecord vote
2021-07-16SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-07-16SenateAmendment(s) offered FA4 Zaffirini
2021-07-16SenateRecord vote
2021-07-16SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-07-16SenateAmendment(s) offered FA3 Zaffirini
2021-07-16SenateRecord vote
2021-07-16SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-07-16SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Zaffirini
2021-07-16SenateRecord vote
2021-07-16SenateAmended
2021-07-16SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes
2021-07-16SenateRead 2nd time
2021-07-16SenateRecord vote
2021-07-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-07-16SenateOrdered not printed
2021-07-16SenatePrinting rule suspended
2021-07-16SenateCo-author authorized
2021-07-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-07-15SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-07-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-07-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-07-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-07-14SenateCo-author authorized
2021-07-13SenateCo-author authorized
2021-07-09SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-07-09SenateRead first time
2021-07-09SenateFiled
2021-07-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=871&Bill=SB3
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/billtext/html/SB00003I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/billtext/html/SB00003S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/billtext/html/SB00003E.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/amendments/html/SB00003S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/amendments/html/SB00003S2F2.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/amendments/html/SB00003S2F3.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/amendments/html/SB00003S2F4.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/amendments/html/SB00003S2F5.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/analysis/html/SB00003I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/fiscalnotes/html/SB00003I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/fiscalnotes/html/SB00003S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/871/analysis/html/SB00003S.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/871/pdf/87S107-16-F.PDF#page=1
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/871/pdf/87S107-16-F.PDF#page=2
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/871/pdf/87S107-16-F.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/871/pdf/87S107-16-F.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/871/pdf/87S107-16-F.PDF#page=5

Bill Comments

feedback