TX SB3 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-12)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to additional funding to school districts for classroom teacher and librarian salaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to additional funding to school districts for classroom teacher and librarian salaries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-03-28HouseRead first time
2019-03-05HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-03-04SenateReported engrossed
2019-03-04SenateReason for vote recorded in Journal
2019-03-04SenateRecord vote
2019-03-04SenatePassed
2019-03-04SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-04SenateRecord vote
2019-03-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-03-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-04SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-03-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-04SenateAmended
2019-03-04SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Nelson
2019-03-04SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-04SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-03-04SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-02-27SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-02-26SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-02-25SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-02-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-20SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-19SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-13SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-12SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Finance
2019-02-01SenateRead first time
2019-01-30SenateCo-author authorized
2019-01-28SenateCo-author authorized
2019-01-23SenateCo-author authorized
2019-01-15SenateFiled
2019-01-15SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1371 (Same As) 2019-02-27 - Referred to Public Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback