TX SB297 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the criminal history record information requirement for applicants for renewal of a license issued by the Texas State Board of Public Accountancy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the criminal history record information requirement for applicants for renewal of a license issued by the Texas State Board of Public Accountancy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1223 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07 Effective immediately
2021-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-19SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-19SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-18HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HouseRecord vote RV#1223
2021-05-18HousePassed
2021-05-18HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-18HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-18HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-18HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-14HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-29HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-26HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-12HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2021-04-12HouseRead first time
2021-04-07HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-06SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-06SenateRecord vote
2021-04-06SenatePassed
2021-04-06SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-06SenateRecord vote
2021-04-06SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-06SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-06SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-06SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-30SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2021-03-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-26SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-26SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2021-01-07SenateFiled
2021-01-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2023 (Same As) 2021-04-07 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB297
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00297I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00297S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00297E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00297H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00297F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00297I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00297I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00297H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00297F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-06-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB297&RcdVtNo=1223&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2021

Bill Comments

feedback