TX SB295 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confidential and privileged communications and records of victims of certain sexual assault offenses.
Title
Relating to the confidential and privileged communications and records of victims of certain sexual assault offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1619 (Y: 135 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Amended RV#720 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1619 (Y: 135 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Amended RV#720 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1619 |
2021-05-28 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-24 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2021-05-14 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-14 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2021-05-14 | House | House appoints conferees |
2021-05-14 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-11 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2021-05-11 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-11 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-05 | House | Record vote RV#720 |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed as amended |
2021-05-05 | House | Amended 1-Minjarez |
2021-05-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-04 | House | Amended 1-S. Thompson |
2021-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-04 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 1374 |
2021-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-04-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1374 (Same As) 2021-05-04 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
CRIME VICTIMS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Open Records
Protection of Personal Information
SEXUAL ASSAULT
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Open Records
Protection of Personal Information
SEXUAL ASSAULT