TX SB291 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the posting of certain project information at a commercial building construction site.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the posting of certain project information at a commercial building construction site.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1370 (Y: 89 N: 55 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1370
2021-05-24HousePassed
2021-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-07HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2021-04-07HouseRead first time
2021-04-01HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-03-31SenateReported engrossed
2021-03-31SenateRecord vote
2021-03-31SenatePassed
2021-03-31SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-31SenateRecord vote
2021-03-31SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-03-31SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-03-31SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-03-31SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-30SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2021-03-30SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-26SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-26SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2021-01-06SenateFiled
2021-01-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB291
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00291I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00291S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00291E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00291H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00291F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00291I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00291I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00291S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00291S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00291E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00291H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00291F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-31-F.PDF#page=14
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB291&RcdVtNo=1370&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021

Bill Comments

feedback