TX SB289 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to disaster recovery.
Title
Relating to disaster recovery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Amended RV#1535 (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Amended RV#1535 (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | House | Record vote RV#1535 |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 1-Morrison |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-04-10 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-09 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Lucio |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
DISASTER RECOVERY TASK FORCE
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
Governor
Housing
Housing--Finance
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY
City Government--General
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
DISASTER RECOVERY TASK FORCE
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
Governor
Housing
Housing--Finance
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY