TX SB2880 | 2025-2026 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2025 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-04-07 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2025 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-04-07 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to abortion, including civil liability for distribution of abortion-inducing drugs, and to the destruction of certain property; making conforming changes and harmonizing conforming provisions; creating criminal offenses; authorizing a private civil right of action.
Title
Relating to abortion, including civil liability for distribution of abortion-inducing drugs, and to the destruction of certain property; making conforming changes and harmonizing conforming provisions; creating criminal offenses; authorizing a private civil right of action.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] | Sen. Mayes Middleton [R] | Sen. Angela Paxton [R] |
Sen. Kevin Sparks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-04-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2025-03-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2025-03-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2025-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2025-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2025-03-19 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2025-03-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2025-03-14 | Senate | Filed |
2025-03-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB5510 (Same As) 2025-04-25 - Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Subjects
Abortion
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
Courts
Courts--Civil Procedure
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Electronic Information Systems
MAIL ORDER
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
WOMEN & CHILD PROTECTION ACT
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
Courts
Courts--Civil Procedure
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Electronic Information Systems
MAIL ORDER
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
WOMEN & CHILD PROTECTION ACT