TX SB281 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of hypnotically induced statements in a criminal trial.
Title
Relating to the use of hypnotically induced statements in a criminal trial.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1724 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1253 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1252 (Y: 68 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1724 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1253 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1252 (Y: 68 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-29 | House | Record vote RV#1724 |
2021-05-29 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-28 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2021-05-27 | House | House appoints conferees |
2021-05-27 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-19 | House | Record vote RV#1253 |
2021-05-19 | House | Passed |
2021-05-19 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-19 | House | Record vote RV#1252 |
2021-05-19 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 1-Lucio |
2021-05-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-18 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-18 | House | Amended 1-Lucio |
2021-05-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-18 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-14 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2021-04-26 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1002 (Same As) 2021-05-19 - Referred to Criminal Justice
HB1599 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - No action taken in committee
HB1599 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - No action taken in committee